Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021