Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note May 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021
Fiscal Note March 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021