Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB699 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 699
1+By: Rosenthal (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 699
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2021;
3+ April 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 11, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
6+ May 11, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 699 By: Taylor
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to public school attendance requirements for students
614 diagnosed with or undergoing related treatment for severe or
715 life-threatening illnesses.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. This Act may be cited as Riley's Rule.
1018 SECTION 2. Section 25.087(b), Education Code, is amended to
1119 read as follows:
1220 (b) A school district shall excuse a student from attending
1321 school for:
1422 (1) the following purposes, including travel for those
1523 purposes:
1624 (A) observing religious holy days;
1725 (B) attending a required court appearance;
1826 (C) appearing at a governmental office to
1927 complete paperwork required in connection with the student's
2028 application for United States citizenship;
2129 (D) taking part in a United States naturalization
2230 oath ceremony;
2331 (E) serving as an election clerk; or
2432 (F) if the student is in the conservatorship of
2533 the Department of Family and Protective Services, participating, as
2634 determined and documented by the department, in an activity:
2735 (i) ordered by a court under Chapter 262 or
2836 263, Family Code, provided that it is not practicable to schedule
2937 the participation outside of school hours; or
3038 (ii) required under a service plan under
3139 Subchapter B, Chapter 263, Family Code; [or]
3240 (2) a temporary absence resulting from an appointment
3341 with health care professionals for the student or the student's
3442 child if the student commences classes or returns to school on the
3543 same day of the appointment; or
3644 (3) an absence resulting from a serious or
3745 life-threatening illness or related treatment that makes the
3846 student's attendance infeasible, if the student or the student's
3947 parent or guardian provides a certification from a physician
4048 licensed to practice medicine in this state specifying the
4149 student's illness and the anticipated period of the student's
4250 absence relating to the illness or related treatment.
4351 SECTION 3. Section 25.0915(a-3), Education Code, is amended
4452 to read as follows:
4553 (a-3) A school district shall offer additional counseling
4654 to a student and may not refer the student to truancy court under
4755 this section, Section 25.0951, or any other provision if the school
4856 determines that the student's truancy is the result of:
4957 (1) pregnancy;
5058 (2) being in the state foster program;
5159 (3) homelessness; [or]
5260 (4) severe or life-threatening illness or related
5361 treatment; or
5462 (5) being the principal income earner for the
5563 student's family.
5664 SECTION 4. Section 25.092, Education Code, is amended by
5765 adding Subsection (a-3) to read as follows:
5866 (a-3) A student's excused absence under Section
5967 25.087(b)(3) may not be considered in determining whether the
6068 student has satisfied the attendance requirement under Subsection
6169 (a) or (a-1).
6270 SECTION 5. This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
6371 school year.
6472 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6573 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6674 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6775 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6876 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
69- ______________________________ ______________________________
70- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
71- I certify that H.B. No. 699 was passed by the House on April
72- 7, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
73- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
74- No. 699 on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1
75- present, not voting.
76- ______________________________
77- Chief Clerk of the House
78- I certify that H.B. No. 699 was passed by the Senate, with
79- amendments, on May 17, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
80- 0.
81- ______________________________
82- Secretary of the Senate
83- APPROVED: __________________
84- Date
85- __________________
86- Governor
77+ * * * * *