Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB750 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021