Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB750 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 750
1+By: Burns (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 750
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
3+ May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to requiring a school district to post the district's
612 employment policy on the district's Internet website.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 11.1513, Education Code, is amended by
915 adding Subsection (k) to read as follows:
1016 (k) A school district shall post on the district's Internet
1117 website, if the district has a website, the employment policy
1218 adopted by the district's board of trustees under Subsection (a)
13- and the full text of any regulations referenced in the policy. A
14- school district shall make available any forms referenced in the
15- policy:
16- (1) on an intranet website that is maintained by the
17- district and accessible to district employees; or
18- (2) if the district does not maintain an intranet
19- website described by Subdivision (1), at a district administrative
20- office designated by the district.
19+ and the full text of any regulations or forms referenced in the
20+ policy.
2121 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
22- ______________________________ ______________________________
23- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
24- I certify that H.B. No. 750 was passed by the House on May 11,
25- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 9, 2 present, not
26- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
27- No. 750 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 10,
28- 1 present, not voting.
29- ______________________________
30- Chief Clerk of the House
31- I certify that H.B. No. 750 was passed by the Senate, with
32- amendments, on May 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
33- 0.
34- ______________________________
35- Secretary of the Senate
36- APPROVED: __________________
37- Date
38- __________________
39- Governor
22+ * * * * *