LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2021 - 87th Regular
House
Bills
HB766
Draft Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB766
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HB766
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 8, 2020
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 13, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 19, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 14, 2021
Compare
Bill
March 31, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note
March 28, 2021
Fiscal Note
March 17, 2021
Analysis
Analysis
May 10, 2021
Analysis
March 31, 2021