Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB766 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 766
1+By: Harless, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 766
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2021;
3+ April 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Jurisprudence; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the entry into the Texas Crime Information Center of
612 certain information regarding orders imposing a condition of bond
713 in a criminal case involving a violent offense.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Chapter 17, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
1016 amended by adding Article 17.50 to read as follows:
1117 Art. 17.50. ENTRY INTO TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER OF
1218 CERTAIN INFORMATION IN CASES INVOLVING VIOLENT OFFENSES; DUTIES OF
1319 MAGISTRATES, SHERIFFS, AND DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. (a) In
1420 this article:
1521 (1) "Business day" means a day other than a Saturday,
1622 Sunday, or state or national holiday.
1723 (2) "Database" means the statewide law enforcement
1824 information system maintained by the Department of Public Safety,
1925 also known as the Texas Crime Information Center.
2026 (3) "Violent offense" means:
2127 (A) an offense under the following sections of
2228 the Penal Code:
2329 (i) Section 19.02 (murder);
2430 (ii) Section 19.03 (capital murder);
2531 (iii) Section 20.03 (kidnapping);
2632 (iv) Section 20.04 (aggravated
2733 kidnapping);
2834 (v) Section 21.11 (indecency with a child);
2935 (vi) Section 22.011 (sexual assault);
3036 (vii) Section 22.02 (aggravated assault);
3137 (viii) Section 22.021 (aggravated sexual
3238 assault);
3339 (ix) Section 22.04 (injury to a child,
3440 elderly individual, or disabled individual);
3541 (x) Section 29.03 (aggravated robbery);
3642 (xi) Section 21.02 (continuous sexual abuse
3743 of young child or children); or
3844 (xii) Section 20A.03 (continuous
3945 trafficking of persons); or
4046 (B) any offense involving family violence, as
4147 defined by Section 71.004, Family Code.
4248 (b) As soon as practicable but not later than the next day
4349 after the date a magistrate issues an order imposing a condition of
4450 bond on a defendant under this chapter for a violent offense, the
4551 magistrate shall notify the sheriff of the condition and provide to
4652 the sheriff the following information:
4753 (1) the information listed in Section 411.042(b)(6),
4854 Government Code, as that information relates to an order described
4955 by this subsection;
5056 (2) the name and address of any named person the
5157 condition of bond is intended to protect, and if different and
5258 applicable, the name and address of the victim of the alleged
5359 offense;
5460 (3) the date the order releasing the defendant on bond
5561 was issued; and
5662 (4) the court that issued the order releasing the
5763 defendant on bond.
5864 (c) As soon as practicable but not later than the next day
5965 after the date a magistrate, in a case described by Subsection (b),
6066 revokes a bond that contains a condition, modifies the terms of or
6167 removes a condition of bond, or disposes of the underlying criminal
6268 charges, the magistrate shall notify the sheriff and provide the
6369 sheriff with information that is sufficient to enable the sheriff
6470 to modify or remove the appropriate record in the database.
6571 (d) As soon as practicable but not later than the next
6672 business day after the date the sheriff receives the information:
6773 (1) described by Subsection (b), the sheriff shall:
6874 (A) enter the information into the database; and
6975 (B) make a good faith effort to notify by
7076 telephone any named person the condition of bond is intended to
7177 protect, and if different and applicable, the victim of the alleged
7278 offense that the defendant to whom the order is directed has been
7379 released on bond; and
7480 (2) described by Subsection (c), the sheriff shall
7581 modify or remove the appropriate record in the database.
7682 (e) The clerk of a court that issues an order described by
7783 Subsection (b) shall send a copy of the order to any named person
7884 the condition of bond is intended to protect, and if different and
7985 applicable, the victim of the alleged offense at the person's last
8086 known address not later than the next business day after the date
8187 the court issues the order.
8288 (f) The Department of Public Safety shall:
8389 (1) modify the database to enable the database to
8490 accept and maintain detailed information on active conditions of
8591 bond regarding the requirements and status of a condition of bond
8692 imposed by a magistrate for a violent offense, including
8793 information described by Subsections (b) and (c); and
8894 (2) develop and adopt a form for use by magistrates and
8995 sheriffs to facilitate the data collection and data entry required
9096 by this article.
9197 (g) This article does not create liability for any errors or
9298 omissions of a sheriff caused by inaccurate information provided
9399 under this article to the sheriff by a magistrate.
94100 SECTION 2. Not later than December 31, 2021, the Department
95101 of Public Safety of the State of Texas shall modify the statewide
96102 law enforcement information system maintained by the department,
97103 also known as the Texas Crime Information Center, to enable the
98104 database to accept and maintain detailed information regarding the
99105 requirements and status of an active condition of bond imposed by a
100106 magistrate for a violent offense, as required by Article 17.50(f),
101107 Code of Criminal Procedure, as added by this Act.
102108 SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
103109 section, this Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
104110 (b) Section 2 of this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
105- ______________________________ ______________________________
106- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
107- I certify that H.B. No. 766 was passed by the House on April
108- 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
109- voting.
110- ______________________________
111- Chief Clerk of the House
112- I certify that H.B. No. 766 was passed by the Senate on May
113- 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
114- ______________________________
115- Secretary of the Senate
116- APPROVED: _____________________
117- Date
118- _____________________
119- Governor
111+ * * * * *