Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB781 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021