05/24/2021 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |||
05/24/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/13/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Record vote RV#135 | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 12/09/2020 | Filed |