Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB788 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2021

                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 788
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of emergency service dispatchers to
 participate in a public safety employees treatment court program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 129.001, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 129.001.  DEFINITION.  In this chapter, "public safety
 employee" means a peace officer, firefighter, detention officer,
 county jailer, [or] emergency medical services employee, or
 emergency service dispatcher of this state or a political
 subdivision of this state.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 person who, on or after the effective date of this Act, enters a
 public safety employees treatment court program created under
 Chapter 129, Government Code, regardless of whether the person
 entering the program committed the offense for which the person
 enters the program before, on, or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *