Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB792 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021