Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB853 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 6, 2021