Senate | 05/14/2021 | Referred to Jurisprudence | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Record vote RV#527 | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | ||
House | 12/17/2020 | Filed |