Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021