Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB871 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021