Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021