Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB981 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 981
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0, one
 present not voting; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 981 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies
 program at Texas Southern University.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.06695 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.06695.  STUDY ON RELIGIOUS STUDIES PROGRAM AT TEXAS
 SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY. (a) The board shall conduct a study on the
 feasibility of establishing a religious studies program that offers
 bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern
 University.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the board shall submit
 to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction
 over higher education and the board of regents of Texas Southern
 University a report on the results of the study.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *