Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB981 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021