H.B. No. 981 AN ACT relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies program at Texas Southern University. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 61.06695 to read as follows: Sec. 61.06695. STUDY ON RELIGIOUS STUDIES PROGRAM AT TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY. (a) The board shall conduct a study on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies program that offers bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern University. (b) Not later than December 1, 2022, the board shall submit to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education and the board of regents of Texas Southern University a report on the results of the study. (c) This section expires September 1, 2023. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 981 was passed by the House on May 8, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110, Nays 29, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 981 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 34, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 981 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor