1 | | - | H.B. No. 981 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 981 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0, one |
---|
| 6 | + | present not voting; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 981 By: West |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating |
---|
6 | 14 | | Board on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies |
---|
7 | 15 | | program at Texas Southern University. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
10 | 18 | | amended by adding Section 61.06695 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 61.06695. STUDY ON RELIGIOUS STUDIES PROGRAM AT TEXAS |
---|
12 | 20 | | SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY. (a) The board shall conduct a study on the |
---|
13 | 21 | | feasibility of establishing a religious studies program that offers |
---|
14 | 22 | | bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern |
---|
15 | 23 | | University. |
---|
16 | 24 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2022, the board shall submit |
---|
17 | 25 | | to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction |
---|
18 | 26 | | over higher education and the board of regents of Texas Southern |
---|
19 | 27 | | University a report on the results of the study. |
---|
20 | 28 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
21 | 29 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
22 | 30 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
23 | 31 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
24 | 32 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
25 | 33 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 981 was passed by the House on May 8, |
---|
29 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110, Nays 29, 2 present, not |
---|
30 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
31 | | - | No. 981 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 34, |
---|
32 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
35 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 981 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
36 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays |
---|
37 | | - | 1. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Date |
---|
42 | | - | __________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 34 | + | * * * * * |
---|