Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB981 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 05/18/2021

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   H.B. 981     87R5707 KJE-D   By: Dutton (Miles)         Higher Education         5/14/2021         Engrossed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Texas Southern University has played an important role in higher education in Texas for more than 90 years. While the school currently offers bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degree programs in numerous schools, it does not have a divinity program or a school of religion.    H.B. 981 creates a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board (THECB) on the feasibility of establishing a divinity program that offers bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern University. THECB would submit the report to the legislature's higher education committees and the board of regents at Texas Southern University by December 1, 2022. This section would expire September 1, 2023.    H.B. 981 amends current law relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board on the feasibility of establishing a divinity program at Texas Southern University.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, by adding Section 61.06695, as follows:   Sec. 61.06695. STUDY ON DIVINITY PROGRAM AT TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY. (a) Requires the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board (THECB) to conduct a study on the feasibility of establishing a divinity program that offers bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern University (TSU).   (b) Requires THECB, not later than December 1, 2022, to submit to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education and the board of regents of TSU a report on the results of the study.   (c) Provides that this section expires September 1, 2023.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021. 

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center H.B. 981
87R5707 KJE-D By: Dutton (Miles)
 Higher Education
 5/14/2021
 Engrossed

Senate Research Center

H.B. 981

87R5707 KJE-D

By: Dutton (Miles)

 

Higher Education

 

5/14/2021

 

Engrossed

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Texas Southern University has played an important role in higher education in Texas for more than 90 years. While the school currently offers bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degree programs in numerous schools, it does not have a divinity program or a school of religion. 

 

H.B. 981 creates a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board (THECB) on the feasibility of establishing a divinity program that offers bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern University. THECB would submit the report to the legislature's higher education committees and the board of regents at Texas Southern University by December 1, 2022. This section would expire September 1, 2023. 

 

H.B. 981 amends current law relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board on the feasibility of establishing a divinity program at Texas Southern University.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, by adding Section 61.06695, as follows:

 

Sec. 61.06695. STUDY ON DIVINITY PROGRAM AT TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY. (a) Requires the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board (THECB) to conduct a study on the feasibility of establishing a divinity program that offers bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern University (TSU).

 

(b) Requires THECB, not later than December 1, 2022, to submit to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education and the board of regents of TSU a report on the results of the study.

 

(c) Provides that this section expires September 1, 2023.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021.