By: Bernal, Guillen, Patterson H.B. No. 999 (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez, West) (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021; May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 999 By: Menéndez A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the use of individual graduation committees for certain high school students. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 28.0258, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsections (a-1) and (h-1) to read as follows: (a-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), this section applies to any student in grade 12 during the 2020-2021 school year regardless of whether the student meets the criteria described by Subsection (a). The commissioner may by rule apply this section to students in grade 12 during the 2021-2022 school year in the same manner under this subsection, if the commissioner determines the application of this section to those students is appropriate. This subsection expires September 1, 2022. (h-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (h), in determining whether a student described by Subsection (a-1) is qualified to graduate, an individual graduation committee is not required to consider criteria under Subsection (h) relating to the student's performance on an end-of-course assessment instrument administered under Section 39.023. This subsection expires September 1, 2022. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. * * * * *