Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB999 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021