1 | | - | H.B. No. 999 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Bernal, Guillen, Patterson H.B. No. 999 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez, West) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 999 By: Menéndez |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the use of individual graduation committees for certain |
---|
6 | 15 | | high school students. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 28.0258, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 18 | | adding Subsections (a-1) and (h-1) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | (a-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), this section applies |
---|
11 | 20 | | to any student in grade 12 during the 2020-2021 school year |
---|
12 | 21 | | regardless of whether the student meets the criteria described by |
---|
14 | 27 | | (h-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (h), in determining |
---|
15 | 28 | | whether a student described by Subsection (a-1) is qualified to |
---|
16 | 29 | | graduate, an individual graduation committee is not required to |
---|
17 | 30 | | consider criteria under Subsection (h) relating to the student's |
---|
18 | 31 | | performance on an end-of-course assessment instrument administered |
---|
19 | 32 | | under Section 39.023. This subsection expires September 1, 2022. |
---|
20 | 33 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
21 | 34 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
22 | 35 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
23 | 36 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
24 | 37 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
25 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
26 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
27 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 999 was passed by the House on April |
---|
28 | | - | 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, 1 present, not |
---|
29 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
30 | | - | No. 999 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 |
---|
31 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
32 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
34 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 999 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
35 | | - | amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
36 | | - | 1. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
39 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Date |
---|
41 | | - | __________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 38 | + | * * * * * |
---|