06/18/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/28/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/27/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Co-sponsor authorized | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/22/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 05/16/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Record vote RV#1203 | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 01/13/2021 | Filed |