House | 05/21/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 11/09/2020 | Filed |