Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR25 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021