04/19/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/07/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Printed in full | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Read | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 01/28/2021 | Filed |