Senate | 05/24/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Record vote RV#1296 | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Filed |