Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR98 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/06/2021

                            H.C.R. No. 98


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family, friends, and colleagues will forever
 cherish their memories of Dewey Douglas Stockbridge of Alpine, who
 died on August 8, 2020, at the age of 36; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Fredericksburg on November 16, 1983, to
 Randy and Connie Stockbridge, Dewey Stockbridge grew up with the
 companionship of a sister, Leslie; he excelled as both a student and
 as a multi-sport athlete at Mason High School, where he played on
 the football, basketball, and baseball teams and developed his
 lifelong passion for golf; after graduating from Mason High in
 2002, he attended Texas A&M University and earned his degree in
 wildlife and fisheries sciences in 2006; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Stockbridge first worked as a wildlife
 technician for the Black Gap Wildlife Management Area; there, he
 was involved in habitat restoration and conservation efforts for
 desert bighorn sheep in Far West Texas, a cause that became very
 dear to his heart; after a few years, he was promoted to the
 position of wildlife biologist at Black Gap, and he continued in
 that role at the Elephant Mountain Wildlife Management Area, which
 spans 23,000 acres south of Alpine; highly respected for his work,
 he was conducting aerial surveys for desert bighorn sheep at Black
 Gap when he died in a helicopter crash along with two other TPWD
 employees on August 8, 2020; and
 WHEREAS, Active in many organizations, Mr. Stockbridge held
 membership in the Texas Wildlife Association, the Wild Sheep
 Foundation, the Mule Deer Foundation, the Dallas and Houston Safari
 Clubs, Ducks Unlimited, the Texas Bighorn Society, and the Desert
 Bighorn Council; he was also a congregant of the First United
 Methodist Church of Mason; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Stockbridge shared a rewarding relationship
 with his wife, Shannon, and he took great pride in their son,
 Jameson, and daughter, London; he instilled in his children his
 love of the outdoors and his respect for nature, and he enjoyed
 going on hunting and fishing trips with family and friends; and
 WHEREAS, Although Dewey Stockbridge's life ended far too
 soon, he has left behind a legacy through his tireless commitment to
 habitat preservation and wildlife stewardship, and he will forever
 be remembered with admiration and affection by all those who were
 fortunate enough to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Dewey Douglas Stockbridge and
 extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Shannon Stockbridge; to his children, Jameson and London
 Stockbridge; to his parents, Randy and Connie Stockbridge; to his
 sister, Leslie Becker, and her husband, Travis; to his niece,
 Aubrey Joy Becker; and to his many other relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Dewey Stockbridge.
 Cyrier
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 98 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 30, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 98 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 3, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor