Senate | 05/24/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Record vote RV#698 | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Adopted as amended | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Amended 1-Paddie | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Filed |