1 | | - | By: Paddie, Meyer, Tinderholt H.J.R. No. 140 |
---|
2 | | - | (Senate Sponsor - Springer) |
---|
3 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021; |
---|
4 | | - | May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; |
---|
5 | | - | May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, |
---|
6 | | - | Nays 1; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Paddie, Meyer, et al. H.J.R. No. 140 |
---|
11 | 5 | | proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the enactment of a |
---|
12 | 6 | | law that imposes a tax on certain transactions that either convey a |
---|
13 | 7 | | security or involve specified derivative contracts. |
---|
14 | 8 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by |
---|
16 | 10 | | adding Section 30 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 11 | | Sec. 30. (a) After January 1, 2022, no law may be enacted |
---|
18 | 12 | | that imposes an occupation tax on a registered securities market |
---|
19 | 13 | | operator or a tax on a securities transaction of a registered |
---|
20 | 14 | | securities market operator. |
---|
21 | 15 | | (b) The term "registered securities market operator" means |
---|
22 | 16 | | a self-regulatory organization, national securities exchange, |
---|
23 | 17 | | financial institution, alternative trading system, trade reporting |
---|
24 | 18 | | facility, broker, dealer, clearing agency, or transfer agent, as |
---|
25 | 19 | | those terms are defined in the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (15 |
---|
26 | 20 | | U.S.C. 78a et seq.), or a board of trade, commodities pool operator, |
---|
27 | 21 | | derivatives clearing organization, electronic trading facility, or |
---|
28 | 22 | | organized exchange, as that term is defined in the Commodity |
---|
29 | 23 | | Exchange Act (7 U.S.C. Section 1 et seq.), or an affiliate, |
---|
30 | 24 | | subsidiary, or facility thereof, to the extent that such regulated |
---|
31 | 25 | | securities market operator is subject to registration with and |
---|
32 | 26 | | regulation by the U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission or the |
---|
33 | 27 | | U.S. Commodities Futures Trading Commission. |
---|
34 | 28 | | (c) The term "security" or "securities" means the |
---|
35 | 29 | | definition of that term set forth in the Securities Exchange Act of |
---|
36 | 30 | | 1934 (15 U.S.C. Section 78c(a)(10)). |
---|
37 | 31 | | (d) The term "securities transaction" means the purchase or |
---|
38 | 32 | | sale of securities by a registered securities market operator on |
---|
39 | 33 | | behalf of a customer, any contract or agreement to do the same, and |
---|
40 | 34 | | any service by a registered securities market operator to |
---|
41 | 35 | | facilitate, match parties to, process, report, clear, or settle the |
---|
42 | 36 | | purchase or sale of securities on behalf of a customer. |
---|
43 | 37 | | (e) This section does not prohibit: |
---|
44 | 38 | | (1) the imposition of a general business tax measured |
---|
45 | 39 | | by business activity; |
---|
46 | 40 | | (2) the imposition of a tax on the production of |
---|
47 | 41 | | minerals; |
---|
48 | 42 | | (3) the imposition of a tax on insurance premiums; |
---|
49 | 43 | | (4) the imposition of a general sales tax on tangible |
---|
50 | 44 | | personal property or services; |
---|
51 | 45 | | (5) the imposition of a fee based on the cost of |
---|
52 | 46 | | processing documents; or |
---|
53 | 47 | | (6) the change of a rate of a tax in existence on |
---|
54 | 48 | | January 1, 2022. |
---|
55 | 49 | | SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
56 | 50 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021. |
---|
57 | 51 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
58 | 52 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment to prohibit the |
---|
59 | 53 | | enactment of a law that imposes a tax on certain transactions that |
---|
60 | 54 | | either convey a security or involve specified derivative |
---|
61 | 55 | | contracts." |
---|