Senate | 05/14/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Record vote RV#1000 | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Adopted as amended | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Amended 1-Shine | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Filed |