Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021