Senate | 05/10/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Record vote RV#470 | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Filed |