Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021