Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR99 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021