1 | | - | H.J.R. No. 99 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Canales, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.J.R. No. 99 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Transportation; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
5 | 10 | | proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a county to |
---|
6 | 11 | | finance the development or redevelopment of transportation or |
---|
7 | 12 | | infrastructure in unproductive, underdeveloped, or blighted areas |
---|
8 | 13 | | in the county; authorizing the issuance of bonds and notes. |
---|
9 | 14 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 1-g(b), Article VIII, Texas |
---|
11 | 16 | | Constitution, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 17 | | (b) The legislature by general law may authorize a county or |
---|
13 | 18 | | an incorporated city or town to issue bonds or notes to finance the |
---|
14 | 19 | | development or redevelopment of an unproductive, underdeveloped, |
---|
15 | 20 | | or blighted area within the county, city, or town and to pledge for |
---|
16 | 21 | | repayment of those bonds or notes increases in ad valorem tax |
---|
17 | 22 | | revenues imposed on property in the area by the county, city, or |
---|
18 | | - | town and other political subdivisions. A county that issues bonds |
---|
19 | | - | or notes for transportation improvements under a general law |
---|
20 | | - | authorized by this subsection may not: |
---|
21 | | - | (1) pledge for the repayment of those bonds or notes |
---|
22 | | - | more than 65 percent of the increases in ad valorem tax revenues |
---|
23 | | - | each year; or |
---|
24 | | - | (2) use proceeds from the bonds or notes to finance the |
---|
25 | | - | construction, operation, maintenance, or acquisition of |
---|
26 | | - | rights-of-way of a toll road. |
---|
| 23 | + | town and other political subdivisions. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.J.R. No. 99 was passed by the House on May |
---|
37 | | - | 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 127, Nays 15, 2 present, not |
---|
38 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.J.R. |
---|
39 | | - | No. 99 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 13, 1 |
---|
40 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.J.R. No. 99 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
44 | | - | amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays |
---|
45 | | - | 4. |
---|
46 | | - | _______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | | - | RECEIVED: _____________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Date |
---|
50 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Secretary of State |
---|
| 31 | + | * * * * * |
---|