Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1106 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            H.R. No. 1106


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Citizens of Victoria lost an admired member of the
 business community with the passing of Earley Elton Calhoun Jr. on
 May 2, 2021, at the age of 75; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Mildred Stapleton Calhoun and Earley
 Elton Calhoun Sr., Elton Calhoun was born in Trout, Louisiana, on
 June 3, 1945, and grew up with five sisters, Hilda, Mildred, Margie,
 Johnny, and Georgia, and a brother, Charles; he attended Yazoo City
 High School in Mississippi and planned to work with his father in
 the construction business, until Holmes Junior College offered him
 a football scholarship; transforming from an indifferent to an
 industrious student, he became the first college graduate in his
 family, earning a bachelor's degree in mechanical engineering from
 Louisiana Tech University; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Calhoun was employed for seven years by the
 Union Carbide Corporation and then went into business as a partner
 in Sparkman Industries; later, he joined Regional Steel, and in
 1986, he became owner and president of the company; and
 WHEREAS, Understanding the important role of community
 colleges, Mr. Calhoun dedicated himself to expanding access to
 higher education as a member of the board of the Victoria College
 Foundation, which has provided scholarships to numerous area
 students; moreover, he gave generously of his time and talents
 through his service on various other boards and organizations; he
 was a valued congregant of First United Methodist Church as well;
 and
 WHEREAS, On June 1, 1968, Mr. Calhoun married the former
 Merle Ann Owen, and they were blessed with three children, Sherry,
 Craig, and Jennifer; he eventually became "Deda" to nine
 grandchildren, Kyle, Ryan, Mattie, Emily, Kate, Adam, Avery,
 Patrick, and Hayley, and watching them pursue their interests and
 participate in activities gave him his greatest delight; in
 addition, he enjoyed fishing, playing golf, and traveling around
 the world with his wife; and
 WHEREAS, Elton Calhoun lived a rich and purposeful life
 centered around his family and his community, and he will be
 remembered with deep affection by all who were fortunate enough to
 know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Earley Elton Calhoun
 Jr. and extend sincere condolences to his loved ones; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Elton
 Calhoun.
 Morrison
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1106 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 14, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House