Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR113 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/18/2021

                            H.R. No. 113


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The Highland Park community lost a beloved leader
 with the passing of Leslie Long Melson on January 24, 2021, at the
 age of 65; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Hamilton, Ohio, on July 20, 1955, the former
 Leslie Ann Long was the oldest child of Bill and Ann Long; "Peach"
 helped nurture three younger brothers, David, Steve, and Jeff, as
 the family relocated for her father's career, finally settling in
 Dallas; and
 WHEREAS, While studying art at Southern Methodist
 University, she met the love of her life, Jim Melson, and they
 married at Highland Park Presbyterian Church on August 19, 1978;
 the couple were blessed with four children, Jed, Ann, Ellen, and
 John, and while supporting them in their many activities,
 Ms. Melson played a maternal role in the lives of many of their
 friends as well; eventually, she welcomed into her treasured family
 a daughter-in-law, Jennifer, and two sons-in-law, Robby and
 Clayton, along with nine grandchildren, Jay, Will, Kyle, Cali Ann,
 John, Charley, Reed, Cooper, and Carter; she encouraged them in all
 their passions, and notably joined a son-in-law in cheering the Los
 Angeles Dodgers on to the 2020 World Series title; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Melson was dedicated to the Highland Park
 Independent School District and gave generously of her time and
 talents to the PTA and the HP Education Foundation; for nearly a
 decade, she served on the board of HPISD, and she was also a
 presiding member of the board of HP Arts; in addition, she served
 her alma mater as a trustee and as president of the Alumni
 Association; a woman of deep faith, she was actively involved in
 Highland Park Presbyterian Church as well; she cherished happy
 times with her loved ones at Marita Ranch in East Texas and Amelia
 Island in Florida, and her compassion for animals led her to adopt a
 host of cats, dogs, and even baby goats; and
 WHEREAS, Although Leslie Melson is greatly missed, the
 passage of time will never diminish the joy and love she brought
 into the lives of all who knew her, and they will forever treasure
 their memories of her warmth, grace, and kindness; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Leslie Long Melson and
 extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn her passing; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Leslie Long
 Melson.
 Meyer
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 113 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 10, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House