Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1877 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/03/2021

                            H.R. No. 1877


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, William and Addie Garner, the founders of Mr. and
 Mrs. G's Home Cooking and Pastries in San Antonio, shared an
 enduring love story, and their family is celebrating the couple's
 legacy as they reflect on the recent passing of Mr. Garner on March
 1, 2021, at the age of 83, and on the passing of Mrs. Garner on
 September 11, 2017, at the age of 82; and
 WHEREAS, William F. Garner Sr. was born in Hartselle,
 Alabama, on August 28, 1937, to Laura Orr and Willie Garner;
 answering his nation's call to duty, he served in the U.S. Air Force
 from 1958 to 1978; during his first marriage, to Geraldine Luckey,
 he became the proud father of three children, Deborah, William, and
 Vicky; and
 WHEREAS, Born on June 7, 1935, in Inverness, Mississippi,
 Addie Beatrice Garner was the ninth of the 14 children of Blain
 Quinn and Addie B. Brownlee; she grew up in the Midwest and attended
 business college in Cleveland, Ohio; in 1960, she married Ewing
 Ford and became the proud mother of three sons, Darrell, LaTeese,
 and China; after her first marriage ended in 1976, she moved to San
 Antonio, where she worked for a time at Sears; and
 WHEREAS, In 1986, William and Addie were married, and in July
 1990, the couple opened Mr. and Mrs. G's Home Cooking and Pastries
 on the East Side of San Antonio; the small restaurant quickly became
 a local landmark, featuring soul food specialties and Mrs. Garner's
 popular pastries; the couple cooked all the food themselves, and
 they were welcoming hosts to everyone who entered their door; as the
 reputation of the restaurant grew, it won many Readers' Choice
 awards from the San Antonio Express-News, and it was regularly
 featured in local TV news broadcasts and in such publications as USA
 Today and the San Antonio Business Journal; and
 WHEREAS, Both Mr. and Mrs. Garner were profoundly religious;
 Mr. Garner served as a pastor, and Mrs. Garner was a member of
 Greater Ball Tabernacle African Methodist Episcopal Church at the
 time of her passing; Mr. Garner was also an active member of the
 Rotary Club; the couple had the pleasure of seeing their blended
 family grow to include 13 grandchildren, Vicky, Michael, Zameika,
 Iyaesha, Tyreese, Yvonne, Crystal, William, Francis, Dimitria,
 Darryl, Tabyana, and Malik, 9 great-grandchildren, Dechele,
 Aaliyah, Aisha, Jer-Mykal, Cyvon, Cyvanna, Destiny, Leila, and
 Frances, and 2 great-great-grandchildren, Liana and Lilly; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply dedicated to their family, their community,
 and their faith, William and Addie Garner set an inspiring example
 of lasting devotion to one another and selfless service to others,
 and they will forever hold a special place in the hearts of all who
 knew and loved them; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of William and Addie
 Garner and extend sincere condolences to their loved ones; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of William and
 Addie Garner.
 Gervin-Hawkins
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1877 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 31, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House