Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1970 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 1970
1+87R30234 BK-D
2+ By: Guillen H.R. No. 1970
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, Over the course of their lives, Lauro and Maria
67 Celia Lopez shared an enduring love story, and their family is
78 celebrating the couple's legacy of commitment; and
89 WHEREAS, A native of Rio Grande City, Lauro L. Lopez was born
910 on May 20, 1924, to Otila Zarate and Ernesto Lopez; after graduating
1011 from Rio Grande City High School, he enlisted in the United States
1112 Army in 1943; he was deployed to Shrivenham, England, where he was
1213 stationed at the headquarters of General Dwight D. Eisenhower, and
1314 he went on to serve as a medical clerk-typist at a field hospital in
1415 Europe; and
1516 WHEREAS, Mr. Lopez was honorably discharged in 1946, and
1617 after returning home, he studied geology at The University of Texas
1718 at Austin; for a time, he worked in the garment district in New York
1819 while pursuing a career in photography; in 1948, he moved back to
1920 Rio Grande City, where he sold cars, worked on the Falcon Dam
2021 project, and found employment at LFD Furniture Store; and
2122 WHEREAS, Maria Celia Lopez was born in Rio Grande City on
2223 November 6, 1928, to Mateo and Hortencia Saenz; she graduated from
2324 Rio Grande City High School in 1945, and she subsequently earned her
2425 license to become a hairdresser, her lifelong passion; she went on
2526 to open the Co-ed Beauty Shop, which she ran for 22 years; and
2627 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Lopez shared a remarkable 67 years of
2728 marriage; their family grew to include five children, Daniel,
2829 Diana, Dalinda, Delia, and David Lauro Lopez, who preceded his
2930 parents in death, as well as a number of grandchildren and
3031 great-grandchildren; partners in life as well as in business, the
3132 couple owned and operated Triple L Furniture & Appliance, which
3233 Mr. Lopez opened in 1970, with Mrs. Lopez serving as the store's
3334 office manager; after 35 years, they closed the store and retired in
3435 2005; and
3536 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Lopez were actively involved in a
3637 number of organizations; Mr. Lopez served as president of the Rio
3738 Grande City Chamber of Commerce and vice president of the Rio Grande
3839 Valley Partnership, and he helped lead the successful effort to
3940 reincorporate Rio Grande City in 1993; he held other prominent
4041 positions in the community as mayor pro tempore, city alderman, and
4142 chair of the South Texas Economic Development Corporation, and in
4243 1999, he was appointed by then-Governor George W. Bush to the South
4344 Texas Development Council, where he chaired the board of directors;
4445 a charter member of his local Rotary Club, he was a recipient of the
4546 Paul Harris Fellow award in 1997; and
4647 WHEREAS, Both husband and wife were parishioners of
4748 Immaculate Conception Church and active members of the Order of the
4849 Alhambra, El Cid Caravan No. 106, which Mr. Lopez led as grand
4950 commander; Mr. Lopez was a fourth degree Knight of Columbus, while
5051 Mrs. Lopez was involved in her children's education as a PTA member
5152 of the Immaculate Conception School, and she also participated in
5253 the Sewing Club and other organizations; they enjoyed traveling
5354 throughout the United States and the world and socializing with
5455 their many friends; Mr. Lopez passed away on June 25, 2016, at the
5556 age of 92, and Mrs. Lopez passed away on March 19, 2018, at the age
5657 of 89; and
5758 WHEREAS, Through their commitment to their family, their
5859 faith, and their community, Lauro and Maria Celia Lopez touched the
5960 lives of countless people during their time on this earth, and they
6061 will forever be remembered with admiration by all those who held
6162 them dear; now, therefore, be it
6263 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
6364 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Lauro and Maria
6465 Celia Lopez; and, be it further
6566 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
6667 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
6768 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Lauro and
6869 Maria Celia Lopez.
69- Guillen
70- ______________________________
71- Speaker of the House
72- I certify that H.R. No. 1970 was unanimously adopted by a
73- rising vote of the House on May 31, 2021.
74- ______________________________
75- Chief Clerk of the House