Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1970 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/04/2021

                            H.R. No. 1970


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Over the course of their lives, Lauro and Maria
 Celia Lopez shared an enduring love story, and their family is
 celebrating the couple's legacy of commitment; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Rio Grande City, Lauro L. Lopez was born
 on May 20, 1924, to Otila Zarate and Ernesto Lopez; after graduating
 from Rio Grande City High School, he enlisted in the United States
 Army in 1943; he was deployed to Shrivenham, England, where he was
 stationed at the headquarters of General Dwight D. Eisenhower, and
 he went on to serve as a medical clerk-typist at a field hospital in
 Europe; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Lopez was honorably discharged in 1946, and
 after returning home, he studied geology at The University of Texas
 at Austin; for a time, he worked in the garment district in New York
 while pursuing a career in photography; in 1948, he moved back to
 Rio Grande City, where he sold cars, worked on the Falcon Dam
 project, and found employment at LFD Furniture Store; and
 WHEREAS, Maria Celia Lopez was born in Rio Grande City on
 November 6, 1928, to Mateo and Hortencia Saenz; she graduated from
 Rio Grande City High School in 1945, and she subsequently earned her
 license to become a hairdresser, her lifelong passion; she went on
 to open the Co-ed Beauty Shop, which she ran for 22 years; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Lopez shared a remarkable 67 years of
 marriage; their family grew to include five children, Daniel,
 Diana, Dalinda, Delia, and David Lauro Lopez, who preceded his
 parents in death, as well as a number of grandchildren and
 great-grandchildren; partners in life as well as in business, the
 couple owned and operated Triple L Furniture & Appliance, which
 Mr. Lopez opened in 1970, with Mrs. Lopez serving as the store's
 office manager; after 35 years, they closed the store and retired in
 2005; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Lopez were actively involved in a
 number of organizations; Mr. Lopez served as president of the Rio
 Grande City Chamber of Commerce and vice president of the Rio Grande
 Valley Partnership, and he helped lead the successful effort to
 reincorporate Rio Grande City in 1993; he held other prominent
 positions in the community as mayor pro tempore, city alderman, and
 chair of the South Texas Economic Development Corporation, and in
 1999, he was appointed by then-Governor George W. Bush to the South
 Texas Development Council, where he chaired the board of directors;
 a charter member of his local Rotary Club, he was a recipient of the
 Paul Harris Fellow award in 1997; and
 WHEREAS, Both husband and wife were parishioners of
 Immaculate Conception Church and active members of the Order of the
 Alhambra, El Cid Caravan No. 106, which Mr. Lopez led as grand
 commander; Mr. Lopez was a fourth degree Knight of Columbus, while
 Mrs. Lopez was involved in her children's education as a PTA member
 of the Immaculate Conception School, and she also participated in
 the Sewing Club and other organizations; they enjoyed traveling
 throughout the United States and the world and socializing with
 their many friends; Mr. Lopez passed away on June 25, 2016, at the
 age of 92, and Mrs. Lopez passed away on March 19, 2018, at the age
 of 89; and
 WHEREAS, Through their commitment to their family, their
 faith, and their community, Lauro and Maria Celia Lopez touched the
 lives of countless people during their time on this earth, and they
 will forever be remembered with admiration by all those who held
 them dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Lauro and Maria
 Celia Lopez; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Lauro and
 Maria Celia Lopez.
 Guillen
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1970 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 31, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House