Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2020 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 2020
1+87R30352 BK-D
2+ By: Guillen H.R. No. 2020
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their
67 memories of Roberto Trevino, who passed away on March 29, 2021, at
78 the age of 89, and of his wife, Hermidia Trevino, who passed away on
89 April 5, 2021, at the age of 87; and
910 WHEREAS, Born on September 5, 1931, Roberto Trevino was the
1011 son of Bruno and Nicasia Trevino; after graduating from Falfurrias
1112 High School, he enlisted in the United States Air Force, and while
1213 in the military, he played football and baseball, which led to him
1314 traveling to compete at bases around the world; he continued his
1415 football career at Texas A&I University, where he was a member of
1516 the 1959 championship team; and
1617 WHEREAS, The former Hermidia Garcia, who was affectionately
1718 known as "Mamie," was born on April 8, 1933, to Alberto and
1819 Manuelita Garcia; she graduated from Kingsville High School and
1920 subsequently studied at Baptist Nursing School in San Antonio to
2021 become a registered nurse; she first worked as an emergency room
2122 nurse at Kleberg County Hospital, before becoming a school nurse;
2223 she met the love of her life, Roberto Trevino, while continuing her
2324 studies at Texas A&I University, where she earned a bachelor's
2425 degree and two master's degrees; and
2526 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Trevino enjoyed more than six decades
2627 of marriage; through their careers as educators, they touched the
2728 lives of countless students, many of whom returned later in life to
2829 thank the couple for the support and encouragement they provided
2930 them; both husband and wife also shared a strong religious faith
3031 that led them to serve their congregation at St. Martin's Parish,
3132 where Mr. Trevino was a 30-year member of the choir and
3233 Mrs. Trevino was a Eucharistic minister; and
3334 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to their family, Mr. and
3435 Mrs. Trevino were the loving parents of three children, Bobby,
3536 Emmy, and J. E., and they were further blessed with seven
3637 grandchildren, Robert Michael, Estevan, Michaela, Maya, Benjamin,
3738 Timothy, and Marcello, and two great-granddaughters, Isabella and
3839 Violetta; and
3940 WHEREAS, Roberto and Hermidia Trevino set an inspiring
4041 example through their passion for teaching, through the rewarding
4142 family life they built, and through their commitment to one
4243 another, and they will always hold a treasured place in the hearts
4344 of those they leave behind; now, therefore, be it
4445 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
4546 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Roberto and
4647 Hermidia Trevino and extend sincere condolences to their family and
4748 friends; and, be it further
4849 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
4950 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
5051 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Roberto and
5152 Hermidia Trevino.
52- Guillen
53- ______________________________
54- Speaker of the House
55- I certify that H.R. No. 2020 was unanimously adopted by a
56- rising vote of the House on May 31, 2021.
57- ______________________________
58- Chief Clerk of the House