Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2020 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/04/2021

                            H.R. No. 2020


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their
 memories of Roberto Trevino, who passed away on March 29, 2021, at
 the age of 89, and of his wife, Hermidia Trevino, who passed away on
 April 5, 2021, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Born on September 5, 1931, Roberto Trevino was the
 son of Bruno and Nicasia Trevino; after graduating from Falfurrias
 High School, he enlisted in the United States Air Force, and while
 in the military, he played football and baseball, which led to him
 traveling to compete at bases around the world; he continued his
 football career at Texas A&I University, where he was a member of
 the 1959 championship team; and
 WHEREAS, The former Hermidia Garcia, who was affectionately
 known as "Mamie," was born on April 8, 1933, to Alberto and
 Manuelita Garcia; she graduated from Kingsville High School and
 subsequently studied at Baptist Nursing School in San Antonio to
 become a registered nurse; she first worked as an emergency room
 nurse at Kleberg County Hospital, before becoming a school nurse;
 she met the love of her life, Roberto Trevino, while continuing her
 studies at Texas A&I University, where she earned a bachelor's
 degree and two master's degrees; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Trevino enjoyed more than six decades
 of marriage; through their careers as educators, they touched the
 lives of countless students, many of whom returned later in life to
 thank the couple for the support and encouragement they provided
 them; both husband and wife also shared a strong religious faith
 that led them to serve their congregation at St. Martin's Parish,
 where Mr. Trevino was a 30-year member of the choir and
 Mrs. Trevino was a Eucharistic minister; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to their family, Mr. and
 Mrs. Trevino were the loving parents of three children, Bobby,
 Emmy, and J. E., and they were further blessed with seven
 grandchildren, Robert Michael, Estevan, Michaela, Maya, Benjamin,
 Timothy, and Marcello, and two great-granddaughters, Isabella and
 Violetta; and
 WHEREAS, Roberto and Hermidia Trevino set an inspiring
 example through their passion for teaching, through the rewarding
 family life they built, and through their commitment to one
 another, and they will always hold a treasured place in the hearts
 of those they leave behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Roberto and
 Hermidia Trevino and extend sincere condolences to their family and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Roberto and
 Hermidia Trevino.
 Guillen
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2020 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 31, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House