Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR302 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/29/2021

                            H.R. No. 302


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Residents of DeSoto lost two respected members of
 their community with the passing of former city council member
 James Zander, 68, and his wife, Linda Zander, 73, on December 21,
 2020; and
 WHEREAS, Born on December 1, 1947, Linda Zander pursued a
 career as an interior designer before becoming the chief financial
 officer of her husband's insurance firm, James Zander & Associates;
 she was a member of the DeSoto Chamber of Commerce Board of
 Directors, chair of the Chamber of Commerce Gala, and former
 president of Keep DeSoto Beautiful; she was also active in the Best
 Southwest Chamber, Leadership Southwest, and the DeSoto Arts
 Commission; moreover, she was named the Bobby Wattle DeSoto Chamber
 of Commerce Citizen of the Year, and in 2017, she and Mr. Zander
 were presented with the DeSoto Eagle; and
 WHEREAS, James Zander was born on April 23, 1952; he was a
 graduate of the University of New Haven, Ohio University, and the
 American College of Financial Services, and in 1983, he founded
 James Zander & Associates; a leader in his community, he served on
 the DeSoto City Council, the DeSoto Economic Development
 Corporation Board, and the boards of the DeSoto ISD Education
 Foundation and DeSoto Dining and Dialogue; he also contributed his
 time and talents to several other civic organizations, including
 the Dallas County ACA Coalition and the Community Emergency
 Response Team; a member of the University of New Haven Board of
 Governors, he was recognized by the school with a Distinguished
 Alumni Award in 2006 and an honorary doctorate in 2018; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed couple were joined in matrimony on
 July 8, 2006; they were valued congregants of Disciple Central
 Community Church, and they delighted in time spent with their many
 friends and loved ones; and
 WHEREAS, James and Linda Zander shared a rich and purposeful
 life together, and they leave behind a legacy of devotion to their
 community that will be admired for many years to come; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of James and Linda
 Zander and extend deepest sympathy to all who mourn their passing;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of James and
 Linda Zander.
 Sherman, Sr.
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 302 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 25, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House