Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR654 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/26/2021

                            H.R. No. 654


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life filled with joyful times and
 meaningful accomplishments remain to comfort the family and friends
 of David Aubrey Barr of Rowlett, who passed away on April 7, 2020,
 at the age of 68; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Robert and Lorayne Barr, David Barr was
 born on March 22, 1952, in Austin and grew up with the companionship
 of a sister, Janis; he graduated from David Crockett High School in
 Austin and continued his education at Southwest Texas State
 University, receiving a bachelor's degree in 1974; and
 WHEREAS, In the course of a successful career, Mr. Barr
 worked in commercial real estate financing at First Interstate
 Bank, Wells Fargo, First American Bank, Citibank, and American
 Momentum Bank, and he later conducted bank examinations with the
 Federal Reserve Bank of Dallas; and
 WHEREAS, On June 9, 1979, Mr. Barr married the former Diane
 Holechek, and the couple went on to share a rewarding union that
 spanned four decades; Mr. Barr took great pride in his two
 children, Matthew and Amanda, and he was delighted to become "Bop"
 to his four grandchildren, Cooper, Kinsey, Nathan, and Olivia; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Barr was a valued congregant of Lakepointe
 Church in Rockwall; in his leisure time, he liked trying new
 restaurants, and he also enjoyed sports, reading, and history; and
 WHEREAS, Those fortunate enough to have known David Barr will
 remember the way he touched their lives with his wit, his warmth,
 and his kindness, and he will forever hold a treasured place in
 their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of David Aubrey Barr and
 extend sincere condolences to all who mourn his passing; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of David Barr.
 Lozano
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 654 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 23, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House