House | 05/11/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Withdrawn from calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Filed |