Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021