Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1088 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 1088


 AN ACT
 relating to the duty of the chief appraiser of an appraisal district
 to provide certain information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 11, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 11.50 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.50.  PROVISION OF NAMES OF INDIVIDUALS RECEIVING
 RESIDENCE HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION TO ANOTHER CHIEF APPRAISER. (a)  The
 chief appraiser of an appraisal district may request that the chief
 appraiser of another appraisal district provide to the requesting
 chief appraiser a list of the names of all individuals who currently
 receive an exemption for a residence homestead in the appraisal
 district for which the request is made.
 (b)  A chief appraiser who receives a request under
 Subsection (a) shall provide the list to the requesting chief
 appraiser as soon as practicable.
 (c)  A provision of law making information described by
 Subsection (a) confidential does not apply to the disclosure of
 that information under this section to another chief appraiser.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 41.413(d) and (e), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  An [A property] owner of real property shall send to a
 person leasing property under a contract described by Subsection
 (b) [this section] a copy of any notice of appraised value of the
 property received by the property owner. The property owner must
 send the notice not later than the 10th day after the date the
 property owner receives the notice. Failure of the property owner
 to send a copy of the notice to the person leasing the property does
 not affect the time within which the person leasing the property may
 protest the appraised value. This subsection does not apply if the
 property owner and the person leasing the property have agreed in
 the contract to waive the requirements of this subsection or that
 the person leasing the property will not protest the appraised
 value of the property.
 (e)  A person leasing real property under a contract
 described by Subsection (b) [this section] may request that the
 chief appraiser of the appraisal district in which the property is
 located send the notice described by Subsection (d) to the person.
 Except as provided by Subsection (f), the chief appraiser shall
 send the notice to the person leasing the property not later than
 the fifth day after the date the notice is sent to the property
 owner if the person demonstrates that the person is contractually
 obligated to reimburse the property owner for the taxes imposed on
 the property.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a notice of appraised value received by a property owner on or after
 the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1088 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1088 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor